THE TASK FORCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Task Force Trust was set up in 1975 with the objective of bringing together the young and elderly through intergenerational projects run by various organisations across the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 July 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Brooke | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Randall | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tatiana Gren-Jardan | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rogers | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WAGGETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203 | £87.52k | £6 | £125.44k | £170.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.64k | £17.38k | £54.97k | £88.28k | £130.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH MARCH 1975 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 29TH AUGUST 1975 as amended on 08 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
A) TO EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY BY TEACHING THEM THE NEED FOR AND THE MANNER OF RENDERING SERVICE TO THE DISADVANTAGED. B) TO RENDER SERVICES TO THE AGED AND DISABLED AND OR OTHERWISE DISADVANTAGED WITH A VIEW TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THEM OR TO THE IMPROVEMENT OF THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. FOR THE PUROSES OF THESE OBJECTS DISADVANTAGED MEANS PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASONS OF AGE INFIRMITY DISABLEMENT OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AFFECTING THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Erridge Road
LONDON
SW19 3JA
- Phone:
- 07968752728
- Email:
- emmarogers@taskforcetrust.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window