THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FURNITURE MAKERS CHARITABLE FUNDS
Charity number: 270483
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for those working within and studying for the Furniture Industry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2012
Total income: £461,949
Total expenditure: £487,368
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 16 December 1975: Standard registration
- 04 July 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 July 2014: Funds transferred to 1015519 THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FURNITURE MAKERS' CHARIT...
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- FURNITURE MAKERS' COMPANY (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2008 | 30/04/2009 | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £462.16k | £531.68k | £341.13k | £258.05k | £461.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £394.68k | £407.80k | £389.93k | £500.17k | £487.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £265.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £217.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £48.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £346.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £16.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £9.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | 20 March 2013 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | 28 February 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | 26 June 2012 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | 29 February 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND OBJECTS AS THE COURT OF THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE SCHOLARSHIPS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
MINUTES DATED 4 JULY 1972 AND TRUST DEED DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1975
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES, PRIZES AND FUNDS FOR THE FURTHER EDUCATION OF STUDENTS WHO ARE MAKING A CAREER OF THE FURNITURE TRADE INSOFAR AS IS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 16 December 1975 : Standard registration
- 04 July 2014 : Removed
- 04 July 2014 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window