EDUCATION DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity seeks to advance education for the public benefit. To this end, we provide advice and consultancy services on education matters to governments and others, we teach, we provide counselling and guidance to young people and adults, we undertake or commission educational research and we provide training and support for educators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£80,388,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £79.18m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.21m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£80,109,000
Raising funds | £429.00k | |
Charitable activities | £79.68m | |
Other | £0 |
£970,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £37,049,333 from 13 government contract(s) and £5,753,572 from 26 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £429.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £79.68m | |
Retained for future use | £279.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £429.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £79.68m | |
Retained for future use | £1.25m |
People

1159 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 22 |
£70k to £80k | 14 |
£80k to £90k | 14 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 3 |
£120k to £130k | 5 |
£130k to £140k | 3 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Abu Dhabi
- Algeria
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Brunei
- Central African Republic
- Dubai
- Egypt
- France
- Ghana
- Greenland
- India
- Israel
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Libya
- Macedonia
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Norway
- Philippines
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Seychelles
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- St Kitts And Nevis
- Syria
- Thailand
- Tunisia
- Uganda
- Vietnam
Governance
- 28 March 2006: Standard registration
- 30 March 2006: Removed (Registered in error)
- 03 April 2006: Standard registration
- CFBT (Working name)
- CFBT EDUCATION SERVICES (Working name)
- CFBT EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- THE CENTRE FOR BRITISH TEACHERS (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Catherine Tutt | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy John Coulson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Edward Muchemi Wambugu | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nimal Jude Hemelge | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN SIMONS | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Joy Louise Hutcheon | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Barron | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Ilse Robin Charis Howling | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANGELA MCFARLANE | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Grant | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.16m | £66.56m | £89.07m | £91.18m | £80.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.11m | £66.54m | £85.80m | £90.39m | £80.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £17.75m | £20.04m | £38.34m | £40.22m | £37.05m | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.92m | £17.80m | £18.05m | £14.43m | £5.75m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £70.47m | £65.99m | £88.40m | £90.32m | £79.18m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £683.00k | £571.00k | £667.00k | £854.00k | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £71.70m | £66.18m | £85.34m | £89.93m | £79.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £35.00k | £34.00k | £44.00k | £459.00k | £429.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £133.00k | £134.00k | £500.80k | £346.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £35.00k | £34.00k | £44.00k | £51.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £375.00k | £327.00k | £409.00k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.98m | £6.48m | £5.88m | £5.24m | £5.08m | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.63m | £9.98m | £9.48m | £9.44m | £13.84m | |
|
Other assets | £31.42m | £39.59m | £38.75m | £40.19m | £36.99m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£79.00k | £711.00k | £5.18m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £19.34m | £27.11m | £21.36m | £22.65m | £22.80m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/12/1965 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 14/11/2013 AND 30/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/01/2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 SEP 2017 as amended on 20 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND EUROPE
Linked charities
- 28 March 2006 : Standard registration
- 30 March 2006 : Removed
- 03 April 2006 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Education Development Trust
Highbridge House
16-18 Duke Street
READING
RG1 4RU
- Phone:
- 01189021000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window