BRITISH CATTLE BREEDERS CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to link practical cattle breeding with science, to improve the quality and productivity of cattle breeding to benefit UK dairy and beef production by means of a conference, farm walks and publications. Publications are circulated to members, sections of the agricultural industry and the libraries of the Universities and Agricultural Colleges as well as published on the web.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 April 1976: Standard registration
- BCBC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Daniel John Pitt | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harriet Jean Bunning | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Craig Dodd | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce John McConachie | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Victoria Ashmore | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Hoare | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph David Kynvin Banks | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Frederick Fell | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Edward Gue | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iwan Rhys Davies | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilson | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathryn Ball | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Williams | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Quinney | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Ben Harman | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Alexandra Brown | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew King | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.57k | £27.18k | £29.36k | £50.97k | £66.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.43k | £27.29k | £39.20k | £57.04k | £60.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH MARCH 1950, AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE BREEDING OF LIVESTOCK BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE, BY COLLECTING, COLLATING AND DISTRIBUTING AVAILABLE INFORMATION AND DATA OF PRACTICAL AND SCIENTIFIC INTEREST, BY PROMOTING THE EXCHANGE OF ALL SUCH INFORMATION AND DATA AMONGST BREEDERS OF CATTLE AT HOME AND OVERSEAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Underhill Farm
Earl Sterndale
Buxton
SK17 0RN
- Phone:
- 07966032079
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window