Financial history GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR

Charity Number: 272135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £69.54k £201.35k £189.64k £368.59k £273.75k
Total expenditure £73.19k £163.44k £155.62k £202.13k £226.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A