MOUSEHOLE WILD BIRD HOSPITAL AND SANCTUARY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objects and principal activities are to: - treat wild birds suffering from injuries or contamination from chemicals and oil spillages, provide sanctuary for any birds unable to be returned to the wild and to benefit the public by the dissemination of information and to enable them to view the activities of the hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
Governance
- 13 October 1976: Standard registration
- THE BIRD HOSPITAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY PETER WHITAKER | Chair | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fynn Stewart | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Larsen | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Jane Desmond | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Jones | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Houghton | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CASS | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILMA ROBSON | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SALLY CRABTREE | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE TRICKEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.24k | £325.76k | £83.79k | £158.79k | £91.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.57k | £130.64k | £202.32k | £284.88k | £148.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 June 2024 | 224 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH JULY 1976 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 10TH JULY 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF BIRDS OF ALL SPECIES WHO ARE SICK OR INJURED OR ILL TREATED. (B) TO PROMOTE STUDEY AND RESEARCH INTO THE DISEASES OF WILD BIRDS AND METHODS OF PREVENTION CONTROL OR CARE AND INTO TREATMENT OF INJURED BIRDS ANDTO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF ALL SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mousehole Bird Hospital
Raginnis Hill
Mousehole
PENZANCE
Cornwall
TR19 6SR
- Phone:
- 01736731386
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window