FARRINGDON SCHOOL PLAYGROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to help children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 November 1976: Standard registration
- FARINGDON SCHOOL PLAYGROUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy John Cowan | Chair | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Barbara Farris | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Mark Norman Kemp-Gee | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £521 | £521 | £521 | £521 | £590 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £550 | £300 | £500 | £385 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22ND DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
(1)IN PROMOTING EDUCATION IN ANY MAINTAINED SCHOOL IN OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN WAYS FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS. (2)IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
FARRINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CROFT
THE STREET
UPPER FARRINGDON
ALTON
GU34 3DT
- Phone:
- 01420588200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window