Financial history UNITED PURPOSE

Charity number: 272465
Charity reporting is up to date (155 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.60m £19.77m £8.90m £15.02m £12.73m
Total expenditure £18.62m £18.72m £10.52m £15.98m £14.45m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.51m £8.37m £7.19m £1.16m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.04m £1.60m £526.72k £1.02m £152.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £669.07k £161.11k £41.45k £0
Income - Charitable activities £15.10m £17.47m £8.20m £13.96m £12.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.89k £28.49k £16.73k £0 £0
Income - Other £442.56k £0 £0 £0 £464.38k
Income - Legacies £5.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.25m £18.47m £10.43m £15.90m £14.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £372.16k £247.69k £84.70k £74.36k £35.17k
Expenditure - Governance £50.03k £183.49k £0 £0 £21.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £2.44m £0 £0 £1.59m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0