Financial history HIGHCROFT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 272684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £250.58k £151.48k £244.13k £27.82k £57.03k
Total expenditure £100.95k £120.31k £293.36k £255.73k £53.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A