W F FABRY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity owns and manages a block of 10 holiday flats in two adjoining buildings on the seafront at Minehead, Somerset primarily but not exclusively for Christians within the Baptist denomination for holidays and short breaks. The charity provides reduced cost holiday lettings for Baptist ministers, Christian workers and others who may be in need of a break but not otherwise able to afford one.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 February 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARCUS ANDREW PATRICK MCCAUSLAND | Trustee | 23 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
DAVID GEOFFREY GREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CHRISTINE MARY LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Rev Timothy David Keightley | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.65k | £117.14k | £121.03k | £111.82k | £107.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.84k | £88.45k | £96.61k | £95.91k | £98.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.06k | £16.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT OXFORD ON 13TH NOVEMBER 1974 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH JUNE 1976
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR SUCH OTHER OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BING MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sunnyfield
Storth Road
Storth
MILNTHORPE
Cumbria
LA7 7JA
- Phone:
- 01995600190
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window