THE SOCIETY OF SAINT WILLIBRORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster closer relationships between Anglicans and Old Catholics
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Belgium
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Scotland
- Sweden
Governance
- 12 May 1977: Standard registration
- SOCIETY OF ST WILLIBRORD (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt. Revd. Peter Andrew Eagles | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Herbert Fadriquela | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
REVD DR CHARLOTTE MARY METHUEN | Trustee | 06 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rt Revd David Hamid | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rev JAMES HARRIS | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|||||||
Rev Bruce Rienstra | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|||||||
THE VERY REVD DAVID MUMFORD | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Father Salvador Telen | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
REV Markus Duenzkofer | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Revd Paul Ferguson | Trustee | 01 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Canon Wietse Berend van der Velde | Trustee | 18 November 2010 |
|
|
||||||
THE VENERABLE RICHARD GILLINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
THE REVD GEOFFREY HARBORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev ALAN RONALD WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.28k | £6.45k | £5.50k | £7.52k | £5.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.75k | £578 | £3.40k | £1.66k | £4.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH NOVEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY EDUCATING MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND OTHERS IN HISTORY, THEOLOGY AND DOGMA OF THE OLD CATHOLIC CHURCHES AND OF THE CHURCHES OF THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Jardine Close
Stourbridge
DY8 4AT
- Phone:
- 01384371320
- Email:
- hontreasurerssw@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window