Governing document The King's English Society

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12T JANUARY 1977 AS AMENDED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1979, 6TH APRIL 1982, 29TH SEPTEMBER 1984, AND 26TH SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEPT 2023 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2025 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING, DEVELOPMENT AND APPRECIATION OF THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AS USED IN BOTH SPEECH AND WRITING; TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ITS CORRECT AND ELEGANT USAGE; AND TO DISCOURAGE ANYTHING DETRIMENTAL TO CLARITY OR EUPHONY
Area of benefit
NO DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.