ST BARTHOLOMEW'S HOSPITAL CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barts Choir's objective is to promote the enjoyment of large scale choral singing. It ispossibly the largest regular amateur choir in London usually with over 300 performers and does not audition for membership. It normally promotes three concerts in each year in venues ranging in size up to the Royal Albert Hall often with leading orchestras. It aims to support a different charity each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 April 1977: Standard registration
- 22 November 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 22 November 2022: Funds transferred to 1197538 ST BARTHOLOMEW'S HOSPITAL CHORAL SOCIETY
- BARTS CHOIR (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.71k | £153.19k | £225.15k | £30.70k | £54.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.96k | £168.63k | £197.39k | £30.16k | £65.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 01 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 01 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/01/1977 AS AMENDED ON 09/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/2010 as amended on 05 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIEM; AND (II) TO ADVANCE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY APPLYING ALL OR PART OF THE PROFITS OF THE SAID PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITES BY MAKING DONATIONS TO SUCH OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES, ESPECIALLY THOSE OF A MEDICAL NATURE, AS THE COMMITTEE MAY SELECT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window