SUSSEX FAMILY HISTORY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SFHG offers encouragement, help and advice to all. 4 meeting centres with monthly meetings at Brighton & Hove, Horsham, Uckfield, Worthing. SFHG library at Falmer nr Lewes. Website and magazine. E-newsletter "Surelye", e-mailing list. Annual conference. Transcriptions, indexes, databases, CDs etc. from publications@sfhg.uk. Bookstall at events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 June 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MICK HENRY | Chair | 11 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jean Kathleen Donaldson | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Victor Izzard | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Edith Allen | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Brian Eaton | Trustee | 09 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Edna Spilsted | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vee Willis | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR TERRY MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR DAVE WICKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.55k | £57.64k | £65.79k | £59.93k | £57.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.89k | £46.22k | £45.23k | £54.79k | £65.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 12 MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 1981, 20 MARCH 1982, 26TH OCTOBER 1996, 7 APRIL 2001 AND 9 APRIL 2005. as amended on 12 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
(1) TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF GENEALOGY, HERALDRY AND FAMILY HISTORY; (2) TO COLLECT, INDEX, PRESERVE, PUBLISH AND MAKE ACCESSIBLE ANY DOCUMENTS OR RECORDS RELEVANT TO OBJECTIVE (1); (3) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF SUCH RECORDS; (4) TO ASSIST THOSE ENGAGED IN GENEALOGICAL RESEARCH BY MEANS OF LECTURES, PRESENTATIONS, PUBLICATIONS AND ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS. (4) COLLECT, PUBLISH, CO-ORDINATE AND MAKE ACCESSIBLE IN THE INTERESTS OF GENEALOGY ANY DOCUMENTS OR RECORDS PARTICULARLY RELATING TO THE COUNTY OF SUSSEX. (B) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF SUCH DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS. (C) TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF GENEALOGY. (D) TO ASSIST EDUCATIONALLY BY LECTURES OR OTHERWISE IN RECORD RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Fairford Close
Haywards Heath
RH16 3EF
- Phone:
- 01444452347
- Email:
- secretary@sfhg.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window