MUSEUM OF ARMY MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Military Museum for Army Music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 23 June 1977: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 December 2015: Re-registered
- MUSEUM OF THE ROYAL MILITARY SCHOOL OF MUSIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colonel Simon Haw MBE | Chair | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL CRAIG HALLATT | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Lt Col Kevin Frazier Nash Roberts MBE | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HENDERSON | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Barber | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Anthony Collis-Smith | Trustee | 05 January 2008 |
|
|||||
DOCTOR TOMASZ MARIAN MAKSYHILIAN CZEPIEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.16k | £23.70k | £22.31k | £28.26k | £28.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.75k | £20.16k | £20.22k | £17.63k | £40.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH APRIL 1977 AS AMENDED ON 29 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
TO UPHOLDING THE TRADITIONS OF THE SCHOOL AND PERPETUATING ITS DEEDS.
Area of benefit
TWICKENHAM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Museum of Army Music
RCAM HQ
Gibraltar Barracks
CAMBERLEY
Surrey
GU17 9LP
- Phone:
- 02087448635
- Email:
- esther.mann100@mod.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window