BHARAT HINDU SAMAJ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HINDU TEMPLE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE. WHERE PEOPLE COME FOR WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS & SOCIAL EVENTS GATHERINGS, YOUTH ACTIVITIES, OLD PEOPLE'S LUNCHEON CLUB,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Peterborough City
- India
Governance
- 24 October 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SivaKishor Uttarkar | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajaalagappan Swaminathan | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gauri Chaudhary | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Atul Nahata | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashish Pathak | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rasila Panchal | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mehul Parel | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kanika Mehta | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bina Pankhania | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Manjula Vara | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Nagasayan Puppala | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Harish Patel | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAJNI REDDY | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ravi Kiran Shashu Putta | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Swapnil Gadkari | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kishor Ladwa | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jayshreeben Mehta | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.70k | £50.36k | £87.97k | £125.80k | £120.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.29k | £46.71k | £53.61k | £68.47k | £70.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.75k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
03 May 2024 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
07 March 2022 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 15TH NOVEMBER 1974 AND AMENDED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 1990 as amended on 27 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF ALL THE INHABITANTS OF PETERBOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PETERBOROUGH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BHARAT HINDU SAMAJ
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Unit 6 NEW ENGLAND COMPLEX
ROCK ROAD
PETERBOROUGH
PE1 3BU
- Phone:
- 01733 315241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window