MALMESBURY CIVIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to promote civic pride in Malmesbury by conserving its built environment, recording its history and maintaining the Riverwalk and Jubilee Garden. We co-operate with the Planning Authority to ensure policies are appropriate for the town and scrutinise & comment on planning applications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 January 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIM POWER | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||
David Heiland | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Campbell Marnie Ritchie | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maria Marsh | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|||||
VALERIE JEAN VERNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES MATTHEW VERNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT MACLACHLAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.63k | £15.03k | £1.60k | £3.19k | £2.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.93k | £2.30k | £3.16k | £3.92k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1977 AS REVISED 29 APRIL 1987 AND 24 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
(I) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (II) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND (IV) TO EDUCATE MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND HISTORIC LOCALITIES OUTSIDE MALMESBURY.
Area of benefit
MALMESBURY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chalcourt
Dark Lane
Malmesbury
SN16 0BB
- Phone:
- 01666824376
- Email:
- chalcourt@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window