Financial history WEST GROUP COMMITTEE OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity number: 275077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.80k £375 £0 £4.91k £3.45k
Total expenditure £4.11k £500 £149 £5.09k £152
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A