Financial history GOOD NEWS BROADCASTING ASSOCIATION (GREAT BRITAIN) LIMITED

Charity Number: 275115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £112.57k £241.20k £493.94k £49.91k £67.70k
Total expenditure £154.87k £126.61k £122.50k £110.44k £181.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A