KINGSWOOD VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and management of Kingswood Village Hall for Community events. These events comprise exercise classes, wedding receptions, amateur theatre, council and general elections, private parties and club meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £7,065 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 April 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT IAN GUNN | Chair | 16 April 2015 |
|
|||||
JULIA DEDI HALE | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHANTAL JOANNA FELIX VANHAECKE | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET CAMBLIN | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MAXINE ANN CAYTON | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN KIPPEN | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIET QUARTERMAIN | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARAH HARRIET WILSON | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Antony Victor Hawker | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|||||
james holman thomas chatfield | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.76k | £40.93k | £57.05k | £70.54k | £64.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.73k | £38.42k | £27.71k | £46.99k | £40.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £460 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.23k | £17.47k | £18.87k | £7.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JANUARY 1978 AS AMENDED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1983 AND 21ST MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND TO MANAGE THE MASONIC HALL, KINGSWOOD AS A CENTRE FOR THIS PURPOSE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
KINGSWOOD VILLAGE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Holt
Alcocks Lane
Kingswood
TADWORTH
Surrey
KT20 6BB
- Phone:
- 020 8655 8500
- Email:
- KVCA@PALMERSTON.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window