Financial history THE PAVILION TRUST

Charity Number: 275192
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.53k £7.15k £8.29k £9.02k £9.48k
Total expenditure £8.35k £11.17k £7.25k £8.83k £80.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A