FRIENDS OF MALMESBURY ABBEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the restoration upkeep and improvement of the fabric of Malmesbury Abbey its furniture ornaments and contents adding to them from time to time. Generally to assist Malmesbury Abbey in any way the Association shall from time to time decide for the enhancement of the Abbey and its contents for the improvement and beautification of the buildings or the services conducted therein or thereby
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 March 1978: Standard registration
- FOMA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DOMINIC SUNDERLAND | Chair | 21 June 2017 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Carmichael Price | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Keith Cloke | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
MARIA LOUISE MARSH | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Oliver Charles Milligan Ross | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
Jamie Lester | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher William Daws | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
DIANA MARY CROWE | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.49k | £4.49k | £5.06k | £31.47k | £3.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72k | £7.72k | £15.77k | £418 | £7.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESTORATION, UPKEEP AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF MALMESBURY ABBEY, ITS FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CONTENTS, ADDING TO THEM FROM TIME TO TIME. GENERALLY TO ASSIST MALMESBURY ABBEY IN ANY WAY THE ASSOCIATION SHALL, FROM TIME TO TIME, DECIDE FOR THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE ABBEY AND ITS CONTENTS, FOR THE IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE BUILDING OR THE SERVICES CONDUCTED THEREIN OR THEREBY.
Area of benefit
MALMESBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbey Office, Old Squash Court
Holloway
MALMESBURY
Wiltshire
SN16 9BA
- Phone:
- 01666823465
- Email:
- foma@malmesburyabbey.com
- Website:
-
friendsofmalmesburyabbey.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window