Financial history THE STANTON HOUSE TRUST

Charity Number: 275205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £78.68k £129.43k £131.03k £183.33k £175.29k
Total expenditure £112.44k £100.12k £129.45k £163.78k £135.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £23.04k £20.08k N/A N/A N/A