THE STANTON HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The encouragement and refreshment of Christians in a retreat environment and the strengthening of the faith of local Christian workers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 06 March 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzannah Rebecca Gabriella Lipscomb | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Gilmour | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Ester Legg | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Pasmore Saunder | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Charlie Cleverly | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dennis | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Annie Payne | Trustee | 13 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.10k | £78.68k | £129.43k | £131.03k | £183.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.78k | £112.44k | £100.12k | £129.45k | £163.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.04k | £20.08k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JANUARY 1978
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pound Lane
Stanton St. John
Oxfordshire
OX33 1HF
- Phone:
- 01865 358807
- Email:
- office@stantonhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window