ZURICH INSURANCE TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and assistance to pupils enabling them to take advantage of the educatonal benefits of visists to and attendance at educational estabishments outside of the United Kingdom and the provision of facilities to enable such visits to take place to further the study of modern languages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 25 May 1978: Standard registration
- 15 April 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 15 April 2013: Funds transferred to 1100417 HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLE OF WIGHT COMMUNITY FOUNDATI...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.10k | £2.95k | £2.26k | £2.25k | £2.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £39.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 11 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 17 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | 05 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 10 August 2010 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH MARCH 1978 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 18TH OCTOBER 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO PUPILS ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN THE CITY OF PORTSMOUTH TO ENABLE THEM TO TAKE ADVANTAGE OF THE EDUCATIONAL BENEFITS OF VISITS TO AND ATTENDACE AT EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENABLE SUCH VISITS TO TAKE PLACE TO FURTHER THE STUDY OF MODERN LANGUAGES.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF PORTSMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window