FRIENDS OF VALENCE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 275686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of The is to raise funds for, support and promote Valence School. Valence School is a Local Authority maintained Special Boarding and Day School for Children and Young People with Physical Disabilities Complex Medical Needs and Associated Learning Difficulties. The funds help provide for extra curricular activities, prizes and gifts for the students and capital projects for the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £103,614
Total expenditure: £82,534

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 1978: Standard registration
  • 24 March 2023: Funds received from 1137388 HENRY SURTEES FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VALENCE SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Wenham Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Saramia Sofia Piazza-Drew Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Kim Ayles Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Matt Strange Trustee 14 November 2016
None on record
Debbie Beaney Trustee 09 November 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11.89k £28.96k £45.57k £25.28k £103.61k
Total expenditure £0 £4.61k £23.23k £83.98k £82.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 16 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 05 September 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 05 September 2024 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Valence School
VALENCE SCHOOL
WESTERHAM ROAD
WESTERHAM
TN16 1QN
Phone:
01959562156