THE ALDINGBOURNE TRUST

Charity number: 276484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Aldingbourne Trust provides support which helps people with learning and or physical disabilities and/or autism to develop and live the life they choose. We do this by providing opportunities to work, make friends, get good housing, make choices and follow their interests.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • Portsmouth City
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 August 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ALDINGBOURNE COUNTRY CENTRE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Susannah Lochhead Chair 23 September 2020
CANCERWISE
Received: On time
Nicholas Rowe Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Rachael Diana Tout Trustee 23 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S CHURCH WESTHAMPNETT
Received: On time
Paula Caryn James Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
ANDREW JOHN PITTS Trustee 30 May 2013
None on record
JOHN DOUGLAS DIXON Trustee 07 December 2010
Age UK West Sussex, Brighton & Hove
Received: On time
JOHN DAVID HILDITCH Trustee 08 December 2009
FRIENDS OF THE ALDINGBOURNE TRUST
Received: On time
FRANCES RUSSELL Trustee 19 March 2003
None on record
JACQUELINE MARY WILLISCROFT Trustee 22 November 1999
CONCERN FOR LIFE
Received: On time
DAVID GODSMARK Trustee 17 February 1997
None on record
ALISTAIR BATH Trustee 16 August 1993
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.15m £7.22m £7.41m £8.93m £9.20m
Total expenditure £7.03m £6.63m £6.77m £8.72m £9.14m
Income from government contracts £4.42m £4.23m £4.46m £4.73m £5.04m
Income from government grants N/A £697.90k £208.67k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £201.96k £984.65k £516.45k £292.95k £243.50k
Income - Other trading activities £979.39k £333.37k £689.65k £1.02m £1.26m
Income - Charitable activities £5.92m £5.84m £6.15m £7.55m £7.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £49.03k £53.45k £55.04k £68.45k £106.78k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.00m £6.62m £6.75m £8.37m £8.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £26.24k £17.68k £24.63k £88.37k £85.18k
Expenditure - Governance £195.50k £210.11k £218.04k £35.00k £16.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £980 £935 £1.54k £2.14k £1.53k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £271.15k £280.27k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £6.66m £6.54m £6.64m £6.71m £6.58m
Long-term investments £99.70k £146.67k £270.81k £260.69k £527.10k
Other assets £1.48m £2.08m £2.89m £2.98m £2.82m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £599.20k £531.01k £929.09k £881.54k £788.20k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ALDINGBOURNE TRUST
BLACKMILL LANE
NORTON
CHICHESTER
PO18 0JP
Phone:
01243544607