Financial history ST MARY'S CHURCH (HITCHIN) PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 276501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £792 £820 £2.66k £15.64k £17.35k
Total expenditure £2.46k £360 £3.50k £3.06k £6.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.20k N/A