Financial history THE PAIN TRUST

Charity number: 276670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £55.72k £65.42k £351.57k £67.52k £70.72k
Total expenditure £8.39k £3.70k £18.31k £52.74k £66.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A