Financial history THE CHURCH LADS' AND CHURCH GIRLS' BRIGADE

Charity Number: 276821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £316.17k £127.18k £187.90k £115.37k £120.66k
Total expenditure £295.20k £136.82k £239.03k £116.74k £150.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £16.68k N/A N/A £11.55k