THE CROYDON BACH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Traditional choral society, with several public performances and Come and Sing Days every year in and around the Croydon area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 15 March 1978: Standard registration
- 17 March 2023: Funds received from 289259 THE JUBILATE CHOIR
- CROYDON BACH CHOIR (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Volti | Chair | 15 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alan Longhurst | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Roseberg | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Elizabeth Alice Kuipers | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA O'DONNELL | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joe Hague | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARION PADGHAM | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.57k | £4.86k | £18.88k | £19.90k | £29.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.44k | £2.66k | £18.77k | £21.11k | £20.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH JANUARY 1979 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR THE WORKS OF BACH, IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH WORKS BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Matthew's Church
Chichester Road
Croydon
CR0 5NQ
- Phone:
- 020-8467 9467
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window