BURY ST EDMUNDS WOMEN'S AID CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide support and accommodation for people affected by Domestic Abuse. We offer temporary accommodation in a safe and supportive refuge where women and their children can recover from the traumatic effects of Domestic Abuse and make informed choices. We also offer a range of community services, courses and counselling to support women to rebuild their lives after abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £108,656 from 7 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 November 1978: Standard registration
- 02 March 2023: Funds received from 1064814 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF STOWMARKET CHARITY ACCOUNT
- Restore Women's Aid (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Iannelli-Popham | Chair | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan O'Neill | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lesley Dearman | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Marie Boyaram | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rachel Stammers | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Leach | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE BURNETT | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|||||
FIONA HARBRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINA DYE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH LARCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £350.42k | £380.45k | £404.27k | £458.99k | £352.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £376.86k | £358.45k | £398.45k | £466.79k | £453.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £139.77k | £181.39k | £180.28k | £131.38k | £108.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH NOVEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND ABUSE OR COERCIVE CONTROL BY THE PROVISION OF SAFE TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION AND PRACTICAL, EMOTIONAL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 715
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
SUFFOLK
IP33 9HQ
- Phone:
- 01284753085
- Email:
- admin@restore-wa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window