THE DUNSTABLE PRIORY PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 277277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Services and activities associated with a Church Of England parish church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,386
Total expenditure: £85

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILLIAN MARY SHORT Chair 01 October 2011
3RD DUNSTABLE ST PETER'S SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DUNSTABLE
Received: On time
Rev Rachel Susan Phillips Trustee 04 December 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DUNSTABLE
Received: On time
ASHTON SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Shauna Zita Maud Dyke Trustee 04 December 2022
None on record
JOHN BRADLEY Trustee 03 October 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DUNSTABLE
Received: On time
HUGH DAVID GARROD Trustee
CHEW'S FOUNDATION AT DUNSTABLE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.10k £17.82k £2.37k £1.67k £2.39k
Total expenditure £15.79k £17.20k £1.38k £515 £85
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 February 2024 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Parish Of Dunstable
Church Street
DUNSTABLE
Bedfordshire
LU5 4RU
Phone:
01582477401