ASSOCIATION FOR INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The AIA is the national organisation for people who share an interest in Britain's industrial past. It brings together people who are researching, recording, preserving and presenting the great variety of this country's industrial heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 August 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jinyue Zhang | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pen Foreman | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Juan Manuel Cano Sanchiz | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Euan Humphreys | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Vernon | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Otis Roger Gilbert | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Wallis | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Arthurs | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian West | Trustee | 02 September 2018 |
|
|||||
KEITH FALCONER | Trustee | 02 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JONES | Trustee | 25 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218.43k | £181.08k | £57.39k | £194.27k | £420.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.09k | £168.62k | £163.19k | £138.37k | £216.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH AUGUST 1977 AS AMENDED 3 JULY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH IN THE ARCHAEOLOGY OF INDUSTRY AND THE INDUSTRIAL PERIOD AND TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN THE IDENTIFICATION, RECOGNITION AND CONSERVATION OF THE INDUSTRIAL HERITAGE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 St. Michaels Close
Madeley
TELFORD
Shropshire
TF7 5SD
- Phone:
- 01952416026
- Email:
- daviddehaan1947@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window