THE FREDERICK WILLIAM POWELL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to boys (who with the approval of the Principal for the time being of the Southend on Sea Municipal College) are taking up or have entered a profession calling or trade involving further study or instruction and who would be unable to do so or continue to do so without financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 07 June 1979: Standard registration
- 19 April 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 19 April 2013: Funds transferred to 1052061 ESSEX COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18k | £733 | £0 | £0 | £112 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 24 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 04 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 15TH MAY 1944 AND SCHEME OF THE 28TH AUGUST 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO BOYS (WHO WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE PRINCIPAL FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE SOUTHEND ON SEA MUNICIPAL COLLEGE) ARE TAKING UP OR HAVE ENTERED A PROFESSIN CALLING OR TRADE INVOLVING FURTHER STUDY OR INSTRUCTION AND WHO WOULD BE UNABLE TO DO SO OR CONTINUE TO DO SO WITHOUT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window