Financial history THE CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF BUILDING SERVICES ENGINEERS

Charity number: 278104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.12m £6.89m £8.47m £9.55m £16.94m
Total expenditure £6.20m £6.61m £7.70m £9.36m £10.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £93.53k £39.00k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £2.38m £2.76m £4.03m £4.33m £4.82m
Income - Charitable activities £3.67m £3.98m £4.33m £757.87k £937.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £64.08k £63.03k £71.54k £199.78k £177.54k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £4.26m £11.00m
Income - Legacies £0 £93.53k £39.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.62m £4.03m £4.31m £5.44m £6.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.58m £2.58m £3.39m £3.92m £3.62m
Expenditure - Governance £35.46k £48.21k £53.20k £144.53k £171.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0