THE CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF BUILDING SERVICES ENGINEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CIBSE publishes authoritative, internationally recognised Guidance and Codes and sets the criteria for best practice in building services engineering, with particular emphasis on the response to climate change. CIBSE accredits courses of study in further and higher education, approves work-based training programmes and provides routes to full professional registration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£9,546,489
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £757.87k | |
Other trading activities | £4.33m | |
Investments | £199.78k | |
Other | £4.26m |
Total expenditure:
£9,364,973
Raising funds | £3.92m | |
Charitable activities | £5.44m | |
Other | £0 |
£204,914 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.92m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.44m | |
Retained for future use | £181.52k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.92m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.44m | |
Retained for future use | £386.43k |
People

67 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
2000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Hong Kong
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 19 April 1996: Standard registration
- THE CHARTERED INSTITUTION OF BUILDING SERVICES ENGINEERS BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Cousins FCIBSE | Chair | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Francis Wilfred Pilbeam FCIBSE | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
WING LUNG MA | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mike Burton | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Walker | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Ruth Kelly Waskett | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Stevens | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Lionel James | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
David Alan Cooper FCIBSE | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
Vince Arnold FCIBSE | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mr Les Copeland | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|||||||
Adrian Catchpole FCIBSE | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.36m | £6.12m | £6.89m | £8.47m | £9.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.29m | £6.20m | £6.61m | £7.70m | £9.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £93.53k | £39.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.56m | £2.38m | £2.76m | £4.03m | £4.33m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.74m | £3.67m | £3.98m | £4.33m | £757.87k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £63.65k | £64.08k | £63.03k | £71.54k | £199.78k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.26m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £93.53k | £39.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.11m | £3.62m | £4.03m | £4.31m | £5.44m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.18m | £2.58m | £2.58m | £3.39m | £3.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £65.15k | £35.46k | £48.21k | £53.20k | £144.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £667.52k | £585.16k | £665.07k | £731.03k | £626.46k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.96m | £2.09m | £2.38m | £2.09m | £2.29m | |
|
Other assets | £2.28m | £1.94m | £2.68m | £2.84m | £3.30m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £36.00k | £24.00k | £9.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.28m | £2.07m | £2.73m | £2.37m | £2.92m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER AND BY-LAWS 17TH MARCH 1976 AS AMENDED ON 13TH FEBRUARY 1985, 23RD AUGUST 1995 AND 7TH MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF 7 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL OF THE ART SCIENCE AND PRCTICE OF SUCH ENGINEERING SERVICES AS ARE ASOCIATED WITH THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT AND WITH INDUSTRIAL PROCESSES SUCH AS ART SCIENCE AND PRACTICE BEING HEREINAFTER CALLED "BUILDING SERVICES ENGINEERING". 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN BUILDING SERVICES, EINGINNERING AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 19 April 1996 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
91-94 Saffron Hill
London
EC1N 8QP
- Phone:
- 02086755211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window