SPIELMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust provides grants to a range of institutions and individuals to help them deal with immediate needs. The Trust also supports a number of charities, particularly those engaged in caring for and educating children and young people in Bristol and the South West of England. It also provides grants to other charities that the trustees believe merit the support of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bristol City
Governance
- 23 August 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR C J L MOORSOM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amelia Hann | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Jennifer MacCarthy | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAREN PETERSEN HANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR P A COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.12k | £227.47k | £282.40k | £266.75k | £265.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.92k | £283.13k | £277.72k | £279.32k | £252.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 8TH JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitefriars Business Centre
2nd Floor
Whitefriars
Lewins Mead
Bristol
- Phone:
- 01179291929
- Email:
- spielmantrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window