THE WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Umbrella organisation for village based community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 29 October 1979: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY COUNCIL (Working name)
- WALSHAM OBSERVER (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Quinn | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Cousins | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Matthews | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Tuck | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Bartholomew | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Trevor Edward Roberts | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Joyce Bartholomew | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Shirley White | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
|||||
David William Murray | Trustee | 21 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.73k | £4.33k | £5.25k | £11.03k | £3.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.03k | £4.13k | £6.66k | £6.61k | £9.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JULY AS AMENDED 16 SEPTEMBER 1970, 7 SEPTEMBER 1992 AND 13 MAY 2010 as amended on 04 Jun 2019 as amended on 04 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES PLAYING FIELDS PLAYGROUNDS COMMUNITY CENTRES AND OTHER AMENITIES OF A SIMILAR CHARACTER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF WALSHAM LE WILLOWS AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING EDUCATION FURTHERING HEALTH RELIEVING POVERTY DISTRESS OR SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 UPPER MEADOW
WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP31 3AY
- Phone:
- 01359 258349
- Email:
- ibarth2@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window