Financial history THE HAVANT YOUTH SAIL TRAINING SCHEME

Charity Number: 278412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.59k £14.34k £18.56k £44.92k £3.77k
Total expenditure £16.81k £6.91k £11.44k £53.77k £8.83k
Income from government contracts N/A £225 £230 £240 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A