LORD BRENTFORD'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making gifts for such charitable purposes as the Trustees decide
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
- East Sussex
- Lambeth
Governance
- 07 November 1979: Standard registration
- 25 September 2014: Funds received from 244989 JOYNSON-HICKS FUND
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VISCOUNTESS GILLIAN EVELYN BRENTFORD OBE, FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VISCOUNT CRISPIN WILLIAM BRENTFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.27k | £4.51k | £5.65k | £3.00k | £4.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.44k | £11.54k | £3.60k | £4.85k | £4.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DEED DATED 13TH JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETON SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Hildenbrook Farm
Hildenborough
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN11 9JN
- Phone:
- 01732921539
- Email:
- crispin.brentford@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window