Rayleigh, Rochford & Castle Point Talking Newspaper

Charity number: 278578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provider of audio entertainment for the visually impaired

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £694
Total expenditure: £3,413

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE RAYLEIGH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
  • THE RAYLEIGH AND ROCHFORD TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
  • THE RAYLEIGH ROCHFORD & CASTLEPOINT TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET BERRY Chair
WYVERN COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
Received: On time
JAN CHURCHILL Trustee 01 January 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.78k £5.83k £21.25k £903 £694
Total expenditure £4.11k £4.59k £3.03k £2.92k £3.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 ARNOLDS WAY
ROCHFORD
SS4 3HW
Phone:
01702541410