Financial history THE HENRY BRADSHAW SOCIETY

Charity number: 278781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.87k £20.65k £5.84k £6.50k £5.89k
Total expenditure £4.53k £228 £2.69k £5.93k £202
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A