THE YOUNG MARKSMAN'S TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouraging marksmanship amongst the young (specifically those under 25 years old).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 November 1979: Standard registration
- THE LOVELL AND GREEN TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA KATHRYN DAY | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Ashley Caleb Abrahams | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Zoe Elizabeth Woodroffe | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEREK LOWE | Trustee | 12 July 2001 |
|
|||||
DR ALEX CARGILL THOMPSON | Trustee | 10 May 2001 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.57k | £5.89k | £5.73k | £6.90k | £6.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.03k | £6.03k | £7.29k | £6.71k | £4.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH OCTOBER 1979
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE SKILL IN RIFLE AND PISTOL SHOOTING IN ANY OF HER MAJESTY'S SUBJECTS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS SO THEY WILL BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN THE ARMED FORCES, TERRITORIAL ARMY OR ANY OTHER ORGANISATION IN WHICH THEIR SERVICES MAY BE REQUIRED BY THE REALM IN TIMES OF PERIL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o National Rifle Association
Bisley Camp
Brookwood
Woking
GU24 0PB
- Phone:
- 01483797777
- Email:
- LovellandGreen@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window