Financial history IPSWICH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 278866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £34.36k £9.76k £11.64k £31.92k £28.72k
Total expenditure £36.75k £7.30k £11.42k £31.50k £19.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A