Trustees FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL LONDON HOSPITAL (WHITECHAPEL)
Charity number: 279009
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH WALKER | Chair | 05 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Pearson Cantelo | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jessie WARK | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Stanley Wright | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Fletcher | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shreeraj Kishorji LATURIA | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh GARDNER | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Mackintosh DENHOLM | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Evans | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Clark | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ridding | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Clark | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor T Beedham | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH JEAN ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN KOPELMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.