Financial history THE TOTNES NATURAL HEALTH CENTRE

Charity number: 279033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £32.17k £14.60k £27.38k £32.91k £35.95k
Total expenditure £35.35k £6.63k £34.81k £43.48k £41.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.33k N/A N/A N/A