Financial history THE SENIOR CITIZENS' CLUB OF CHIGWELL

Charity number: 279167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.93k £6.23k £9.27k £15.47k £15.32k
Total expenditure £6.41k £963 £6.86k £10.83k £13.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A