BURY'S STRAY CAT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To reduce the suffering of stray & feral cats. Neutering is encouraged as the only humane method of control. To rescue & rehome as many cats as possible. Euthanasia is only on a vet's advice. To help with the cost of neutering & treatment in cases of hardship. To take responsibility for ill or injured cats until an owner is traced. To maintian high standards of care for cats we are look after.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
67 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 February 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Purnell | Chair | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Plummer | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Smith | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Baulch | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Starling | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.62k | £261.19k | £368.98k | £229.82k | £129.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.65k | £108.10k | £106.69k | £113.31k | £143.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2025 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
08 March 2025 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2023 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 February 2023 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 1980 AS AMENDED 16 JULY 1991, 26 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND 9 JUNE 2001 as amended on 08 Aug 2009 as amended on 12 Jun 2010 as amended on 07 Jun 2013
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO CATS BY RESCUING, PROVIDING TREATMENT, CARE AND ACCOMMODATION FOR CATS IN NEED
Area of benefit
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIARS ORCHARD
LITTLE WHELNETHAM
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP30 0UH
- Phone:
- 01284388455
- Email:
- admin@burystraycatfund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window