THE CLAPHAM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and encourage the following objects:- 1) To encourage high standards in architecture & planning. 2) To stimulate public interest in Clapham and care for its beauty, history and character of the area and its surroundings. 3) To encourage the preservation, protection, development and enhancement of features of historic interest or public amenity in Clapham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 02 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK LEFFLER | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hon Saimo Chahal KC | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Jake Andrew Johnson | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hudson Haworth | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES SINCLAIR JOHNSTON | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon Robert Eagles | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Barry | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Macnair | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Inglis Jones | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Eastman | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julia Barbara Barfield | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ann White | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STEWART BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.76k | £9.17k | £12.38k | £10.08k | £8.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.72k | £8.81k | £12.04k | £12.62k | £12.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1976 AS AMENDED 13TH FEBRUARY 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: 1. TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING. 2. TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN CLAPHAM AND IN THE CONDUCT OF CIVIC AND PUBLIC AFFAIRS AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE AREA AND ITS SURROUNDINGS. 3. TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND ENHANCEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR PUBLIC AMENITY IN CLAPHAM.
Area of benefit
CLAPHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Grafton Square
LONDON
SW4 0DE
- Phone:
- 07880781524
- Email:
- simoneagles1@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
claphamsociety.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window